NY S06379 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the operation of NYC transit authority subways or trains without at least one conductor on board; requires a conductor on any subway or train operated by such authority whenever the subway or train has more than two cars attached to the engine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the operation of NYC transit authority subways or trains without at least one conductor on board; requires a conductor on any subway or train operated by such authority whenever the subway or train has more than two cars attached to the engine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2023-04-18SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A06455 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback