NY S06370 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6370A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6370A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the limitation of overtime compensation in final average salary calculations from fifteen percent to thirty percent.
Title
Increases the limitation of overtime compensation in final average salary calculations from fifteen percent to thirty percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6370A |
2022-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07370 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - print number 7370a