NY S06362 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - SIGNED CHAP.104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - SIGNED CHAP.104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the "COVID-19 Emergency Eviction and Foreclosure Prevention Act of 2020" and the "COVID-19 Emergency Protect Our Small Businesses Act of 2021" until August 31, 2021.
Title
Extends the "COVID-19 Emergency Eviction and Foreclosure Prevention Act of 2020" and the "COVID-19 Emergency Protect Our Small Businesses Act of 2021" until August 31, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.104 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.64 |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | substituted for a7175a |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6362A |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.796 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07175 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - substituted by s6362a