NY S06358 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - SIGNED CHAP.249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - SIGNED CHAP.249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the location of service centers for independent living.
Title
Relates to the location of service centers for independent living.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.249 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.191 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9950 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1449 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09950 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6358