NY S06357 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health clubs with a membership of 50 or more to have at least 1 automated external defibrillator on the premises which is accessible to the staff, members and guests.
Title
Requires health clubs with a membership of 50 or more to have at least 1 automated external defibrillator on the premises which is accessible to the staff, members and guests.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.937 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A11110 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - referred to health