NY S06354 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - PRINT NUMBER 6354A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - PRINT NUMBER 6354A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to equality of rights and protection against discrimination.
Title
Relates to equality of rights and protection against discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6354A |
2018-03-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-17 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08461 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken