NY S06346 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends authorization for the county of Lewis to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes until November 30, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends authorization for the county of Lewis to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes until November 30, 2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-28SenateSIGNED CHAP.259
2023-07-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-05-31Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-05-31Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-31Assemblyhome rule request
2023-05-31Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.382
2023-05-31Assemblysubstituted for a6552
2023-05-24Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-05-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-24SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.948
2023-04-17SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06552 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - substituted by s6346

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback