NY S06344 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - PRINT NUMBER 6344A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to bioheating fuel requirements and bioheating fuel tax credits; requires all heating oil sold for use in any building in the state on and after July 1, 2022 be bioheating fuel that contains a minimum percent biodiesel or renewable hydrocarbon diesel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to bioheating fuel requirements and bioheating fuel tax credits; requires all heating oil sold for use in any building in the state on and after July 1, 2022 be bioheating fuel that contains a minimum percent biodiesel or renewable hydrocarbon diesel.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 6344A
2020-07-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08134 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback