NY S06337 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certified first responders in a program relating to recertification of persons providing emergency medical care and removes the designation of such program as a pilot or demonstration program; and extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to recertification of persons providing emergency medical care.
Title
Includes certified first responders in a program relating to recertification of persons providing emergency medical care and removes the designation of such program as a pilot or demonstration program; and extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to recertification of persons providing emergency medical care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.87 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.417 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8058a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1526 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6337A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08058 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.87