NY S06335 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8288B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8288B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires combination gas and electric corporations, the New York Power Authority, and the Long Island Power Authority to provide an annual transparency statement to customers detailing certain charges on a gross basis which are included in each customer's delivery service portion of their utility bill.
Title
Requires combination gas and electric corporations, the New York Power Authority, and the Long Island Power Authority to provide an annual transparency statement to customers detailing certain charges on a gross basis which are included in each customer's delivery service portion of their utility bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8288B |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6335C |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.96 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6335B |
2018-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6335A |
2017-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1356 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08288 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled