NY S06331 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the terms of office for the Trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the Town of East Hampton from two to four years; provides for the staggering of such terms of office; further provides that at the biennial election to be held in said town in two thousand twenty-three, the five candidates receiving the largest number of votes shall be entitled to hold office for a term of four years and the remaining four successful candidates shall hold office for a term of two years.
Title
Increases the terms of office for the Trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the Town of East Hampton from two to four years; provides for the staggering of such terms of office; further provides that at the biennial election to be held in said town in two thousand twenty-three, the five candidates receiving the largest number of votes shall be entitled to hold office for a term of four years and the remaining four successful candidates shall hold office for a term of two years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.366 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.673 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7030 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1497 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07030 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6331