NY S06322 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6322A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Grants service credit to members of the uniformed correction force of the New York city department of correction covered by provisions of law for over 25 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants service credit to members of the uniformed correction force of the New York city department of correction covered by provisions of law for over 25 years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 6322A
2024-03-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-05-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-04-13SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06865 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - print number 6865a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback