NY S06321 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information about the sexual orientation and gender identity by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information about the sexual orientation and gender identity by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.191 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.205 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7929 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1268 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07929 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.191