NY S06320 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets the rate of taxation on estates; provides that if the taxable estate exceeds the basic exclusion amount the credit shall be the amount of tax that would be due if the amount on which the tax is to be computed is equal to the basic exclusion amount.
Title
Sets the rate of taxation on estates; provides that if the taxable estate exceeds the basic exclusion amount the credit shall be the amount of tax that would be due if the amount on which the tax is to be computed is equal to the basic exclusion amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2067 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6320B |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6320A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01522 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means