NY S06319 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the scope of responsibilities of the office of addiction services and supports; defines addiction professional.
Title
Relates to the scope of responsibilities of the office of addiction services and supports; defines addiction professional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.934 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6319A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.938 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A08074 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse