NY S06318 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the Cedarmore corporation for community programs.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the Cedarmore corporation for community programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6318B |
2017-06-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6318A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1124 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07711 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - amended on third reading 7711d