NY S06309 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the "detective investigators" or "rackets investigators" employed in the office of a district attorney located within the county of Nassau, the county of Suffolk, or the city of New York in the MTA Long Island Rail Road no fare program.
Title
Includes the "detective investigators" or "rackets investigators" employed in the office of a district attorney located within the county of Nassau, the county of Suffolk, or the city of New York in the MTA Long Island Rail Road no fare program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1104 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1512 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08031 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions