NY S06299 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that an assessment of the role that permit approvals for air contamination sources plays in contributing to stationary and mobile sources of air pollution be included in an addendum to the strategies for the development of community emission reduction programs; requires disclosure of last mile warehouse permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that an assessment of the role that permit approvals for air contamination sources plays in contributing to stationary and mobile sources of air pollution be included in an addendum to the strategies for the development of community emission reduction programs; requires disclosure of last mile warehouse permits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2024-01-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 6299A
2024-01-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2023-04-12SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A09267 (Same As) 2024-02-23 - referred to environmental conservation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback