NY S06296 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6296A
Pending: Senate New York City Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6296A
Pending: Senate New York City Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires city school districts in cities having a population of one million or more to develop class size reduction plans beginning in September 2022 to reduce the average classroom size citywide, by district, and by school in such districts by the 2027-2028 school year.
Title
Requires city school districts in cities having a population of one million or more to develop class size reduction plans beginning in September 2022 to reduce the average classroom size citywide, by district, and by school in such districts by the 2027-2028 school year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6296A |
2022-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2021-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07447 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - print number 7447a