NY S06296 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends certain provisions of law relating to the use of certain voting machines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends certain provisions of law relating to the use of certain voting machines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.482
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.516
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a9178a
2012-06-18Assemblyreferred to election law
2012-06-18AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-18SenateREPASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6296A
2012-06-12SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2012-06-12Senatereturned to senate
2012-06-12AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2012-02-29Assemblyreferred to education
2012-02-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-02-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-02-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-02-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.192
2012-01-23SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A09178 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6296a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback