NY S06292 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the total amount of bonds the Buffalo sewer authority may issue from two hundred fifty million to five hundred million dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the total amount of bonds the Buffalo sewer authority may issue from two hundred fifty million to five hundred million dollars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A2137
2023-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1286
2023-05-16SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-04-12SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02137 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - signed chap.374

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback