NY S06292 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - VETOED MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - VETOED MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office for people with developmental disabilities to submit a detailed report of proposed savings and investment initiatives within the executive budget.
Title
Requires the office for people with developmental disabilities to submit a detailed report of proposed savings and investment initiatives within the executive budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.54 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.722 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7352 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1208 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07352 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6292