NY S06286 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each social services district to maintain a waiting list of eligible families who have applied for child care assistance; further requires the local districts to report such list to the office of children and family services who shall then compile such reports and issue one report to the legislature annually; further requires the social services districts to collect data regarding the income of families who have applied, were denied and received child care assistance and issue a report to the office of children and family services who shall then compile such reports and issue one report to the legislature annually.
Title
Requires each social services district to maintain a waiting list of eligible families who have applied for child care assistance; further requires the local districts to report such list to the office of children and family services who shall then compile such reports and issue one report to the legislature annually; further requires the social services districts to collect data regarding the income of families who have applied, were denied and received child care assistance and issue a report to the office of children and family services who shall then compile such reports and issue one report to the legislature annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.502 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05836 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.418