NY S06274 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7357A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7357A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to create an assistance hotline for individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities and complex behavioral needs.
Title
Establishes a pilot program to create an assistance hotline for individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities and complex behavioral needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7357A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1535 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6274B |
2021-05-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6274A |
2021-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07357 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - tabled