NY S06272 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school emergency response drills to include drills to respond to an active shooter, other lethal attackers, and attacks with explosives, or chemical, biological or radiological agents.
Title
Requires school emergency response drills to include drills to respond to an active shooter, other lethal attackers, and attacks with explosives, or chemical, biological or radiological agents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1845 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6272A |
2018-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08887 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education