NY S06262 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes a rule that vacancies of the joint commission on public ethics with respect to a member of the commission first appointed pursuant to section 6 of part A of chapter 399 of the laws of 2011 by a legislative leader, the legislative leaders of the same political party in the same house shall appoint a member to fill such vacancy irrespective of whether that legislative leader's political party is in the majority or minority.
Title
Removes a rule that vacancies of the joint commission on public ethics with respect to a member of the commission first appointed pursuant to section 6 of part A of chapter 399 of the laws of 2011 by a legislative leader, the legislative leaders of the same political party in the same house shall appoint a member to fill such vacancy irrespective of whether that legislative leader's political party is in the majority or minority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-22 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1148 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |