NY S06261 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the composition of the voting majority upon the appointment and removal of the executive director of the joint commission on public ethics; provides for the appointment and removal of the executive director by a vote of a majority of the commission, regardless of political appointment.
Title
Modifies the composition of the voting majority upon the appointment and removal of the executive director of the joint commission on public ethics; provides for the appointment and removal of the executive director by a vote of a majority of the commission, regardless of political appointment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-22 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.767 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08140 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations