NY S06251 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of taxation and finance to provide notice to a property owner who is a veteran or who is the spouse or unmarried surviving spouse of a veteran when a school district grants a school tax exemption or abatement for veterans and provide direction on how to apply for such exemption or abatement.
Title
Directs the department of taxation and finance to provide notice to a property owner who is a veteran or who is the spouse or unmarried surviving spouse of a veteran when a school district grants a school tax exemption or abatement for veterans and provide direction on how to apply for such exemption or abatement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6251A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.968 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |