NY S06248 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to emergency intervention for persons impaired by substances.
Title
Relates to emergency intervention for persons impaired by substances.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] |
Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2016-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.847 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-04-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6248B |
2016-04-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2016-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6248A |
2016-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A09501 (Same As) 2016-04-20 - print number 9501a