NY S06244 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7953A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7953A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to patronage capital contributions, allocations and retirements.
Title
Relates to patronage capital contributions, allocations and retirements.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7953A |
2018-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6244A |
2018-05-30 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2018-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.333 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1355 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07953 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.300