NY S06243 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to vendor fees for video lottery gaming for certain vendor tracks located within Oneida county, within fifteen miles of a Native American class III gaming facility.
Title
Relates to vendor fees for video lottery gaming for certain vendor tracks located within Oneida county, within fifteen miles of a Native American class III gaming facility.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6243A |
2017-06-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1511 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A08066 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means