NY S06235 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.608
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes the county of Ulster within the definition of a designated community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes the county of Ulster within the definition of a designated community.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-06AssemblySIGNED CHAP.608
2019-12-06AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.33
2019-11-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.439
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a129
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to local governments
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1228
2019-06-06SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-28SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A00129 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s6235

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback