NY S06232 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires medical certificate portion of death certificates to include a determination of whether the deceased suffered a sudden, unexpected death in epilepsy.
Title
Requires medical certificate portion of death certificates to include a determination of whether the deceased suffered a sudden, unexpected death in epilepsy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1177 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08444 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - referred to health