NY S06228 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, for an additional 4 years, the provisions of Lauren's law, providing for the election to or declining to elect to register in the donate life registry for organ and tissue donation.
Title
Extends, for an additional 4 years, the provisions of Lauren's law, providing for the election to or declining to elect to register in the donate life registry for organ and tissue donation.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Sen. Marc Panepinto [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.174 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.609 |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8594 |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.45 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08594 (Same As) 2016-05-18 - substituted by s6228