NY S06225 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6225B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for supports and services for unaccompanied minors with no lawful immigration status including legal representation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for supports and services for unaccompanied minors with no lawful immigration status including legal representation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 6225B
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2019-06-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 6225A
2019-06-13SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2019-05-24SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES

Same As/Similar To

A07815 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - reported referred to rules

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback