NY S06224 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the display of the United States flag over the capitol building to honor selected veterans.
Title
Relates to the display of the United States flag over the capitol building to honor selected veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.243 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A09526 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - referred to governmental operations