NY S06222 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting civilian drone use within 1000 feet of a correctional facility except when in use under the Federal Aviation Administration's authorization.
Title
Relates to prohibiting civilian drone use within 1000 feet of a correctional facility except when in use under the Federal Aviation Administration's authorization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6222C |
2016-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.714 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6222B |
2016-03-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2016-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6222A |
2016-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08625 (Same As) 2016-06-03 - print number 8625c