NY S06218 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - VETOED MEMO.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts "the planned offshore wind transmission act"; requires the New York state energy and research development authority to establish a plan for improved transmission planning and coordinating systems for an offshore grid; requires the authority conduct a benefit-cost-analysis and ratepayer impact study to determine the overall costs of implementing planned transmission and coordinated systems for an offshore grid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts "the planned offshore wind transmission act"; requires the New York state energy and research development authority to establish a plan for improved transmission planning and coordinating systems for an offshore grid; requires the authority conduct a benefit-cost-analysis and ratepayer impact study to determine the overall costs of implementing planned transmission and coordinated systems for an offshore grid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-20SenateVETOED MEMO.37
2023-10-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-21Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2023-06-21Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2023-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.897
2023-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a7764
2023-06-09Assemblyreferred to energy
2023-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6218A
2023-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.668
2023-04-04SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07764 (Same As) 2023-06-21 - substituted by s6218a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback