NY S06214 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - ordered to third reading cal.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - ordered to third reading cal.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a voter may register to vote at any residence to which the voter maintains a continuous connection with an intent to return, including a second home or a vacation home.
Title
Provides that a voter may register to vote at any residence to which the voter maintains a continuous connection with an intent to return, including a second home or a vacation home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.213 |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | substituted for a6482 |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2022-01-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.9 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.877 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06482 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - substituted by s6214