NY S06210 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the state fire prevention and building code council to update the state fire prevention and building code and the state energy conservation construction code within 18 months of the publication of any updated or revised edition of the international and national codes relating thereto, so as to ensure that the state's codes reflect such revisions and updates.
Title
Directs the state fire prevention and building code council to update the state fire prevention and building code and the state energy conservation construction code within 18 months of the publication of any updated or revised edition of the international and national codes relating thereto, so as to ensure that the state's codes reflect such revisions and updates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6210B |
2022-05-23 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.339 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1091 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6210A |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03559 (Same As) 2022-05-20 - print number 3559b