NY S06209 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - SIGNED CHAP.95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits race discrimination based on natural hair or hairstyles; defines "race" for certain specific purposes to include, but not be limited to, ancestry, color, ethnic group identification, and ethnic background, and to include traits historically associated with race, including but not limited to, hair texture and protective hairstyles; and defines "protective hairstyles" to include, but not be limited to, such hairstyles as braids, locks, and twists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits race discrimination based on natural hair or hairstyles; defines "race" for certain specific purposes to include, but not be limited to, ancestry, color, ethnic group identification, and ethnic background, and to include traits historically associated with race, including but not limited to, hair texture and protective hairstyles; and defines "protective hairstyles" to include, but not be limited to, such hairstyles as braids, locks, and twists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12AssemblySIGNED CHAP.95
2019-07-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.657
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7797a
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1438
2019-06-17SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 6209A
2019-06-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-05-23SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07797 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6209a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback