NY S06205 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions regarding hotel/motel taxes in Chautauqua county until November 30, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions regarding hotel/motel taxes in Chautauqua county until November 30, 2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2023-05-31SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-31Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-05-31SenateRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2023-05-24Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-05-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.938
2023-04-03SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback