NY S06205 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6205A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6205A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of information technology services to contract with a private entity to conduct an examination and evaluation of New York state's information technology infrastructure, data use and management, policies, procedures and operational processes.
Title
Directs the office of information technology services to contract with a private entity to conduct an examination and evaluation of New York state's information technology infrastructure, data use and management, policies, procedures and operational processes.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Oberacker [R] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Mike Martucci [R] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Internet And Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6205A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2021-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A08076 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - print number 8076a