NY S06202 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to direct marketing activities for New York beverages; and authorizes the sale of beer and wine at movie theaters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to direct marketing activities for New York beverages; and authorizes the sale of beer and wine at movie theaters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to economic development
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1582
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 6202A
2019-06-10SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE
2019-05-22SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A07681 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - print number 7681a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback