NY S06202 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes non-residents of the county of Allegany to be appointed as peace officers for the society for the prevention of cruelty to animals for such county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes non-residents of the county of Allegany to be appointed as peace officers for the society for the prevention of cruelty to animals for such county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.497
2012-12-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.302
2012-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a9306
2012-06-13Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-04-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-04-19Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-04-18Senate1ST REPORT CAL.537
2012-01-12SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09306 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s6202

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback