NY S06191 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that altered motor vehicles commonly referred to as "stretch limousines" which were altered on or after January 1, 2021, shall have at least two safety belts for the front seat and at least one safety belt for the rear seat for each passenger for which the rear seat of such vehicle was designed.
Title
Provides that altered motor vehicles commonly referred to as "stretch limousines" which were altered on or after January 1, 2021, shall have at least two safety belts for the front seat and at least one safety belt for the rear seat for each passenger for which the rear seat of such vehicle was designed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.10 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.79 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6191C |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.7 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | rules report cal.7 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-10 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9057 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.79 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6191C |
2020-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6191B |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6191A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1089 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08475 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
A02157 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
A09057 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.10
A02157 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
A09057 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.10