NY S06188 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants retroactive tier V membership in the NY state and local employees' retirement system for Daniel Miller.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants retroactive tier V membership in the NY state and local employees' retirement system for Daniel Miller.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-17SenateSIGNED CHAP.663
2023-11-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-10Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.853
2023-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a6609
2023-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-07SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1682
2023-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-04-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06609 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6188

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback