NY S06188 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - VETOED MEMO.45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - VETOED MEMO.45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a certain contract of the West Islip union free school district.
Title
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a certain contract of the West Islip union free school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.45 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.597 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7025a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6188A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1024 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07025 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6188a