NY S06176 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing feminine hygiene products at no cost to individuals in correctional facilities and to any other individual in a punitive custodial setting.
Title
Relates to providing feminine hygiene products at no cost to individuals in correctional facilities and to any other individual in a punitive custodial setting.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00588 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - substituted by s8821a