NY S06176 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of chapter 405 of the laws of 2005 for two years which chapter authorizes the county of Albany to impose a county mortgage recording tax.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of chapter 405 of the laws of 2005 for two years which chapter authorizes the county of Albany to impose a county mortgage recording tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.311 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.488 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8958 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1209 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08958 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s6176